Williams v. Stewart et al

Plaintiff: David Williams
Defendant: Kathy Stewart, Moses Jackson, Randy Watson, Greg Harmon, Ray Hobbs, Norman Hodge and Does
Case Number: 2:2010cv00039
Filed: March 22, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2011 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 140 USCA Judgment remanding to this Court the assessment and collection of the $455.00 appellate filing and docketing fees. The Director of the ADC shall collect from plaintiff's prison trust account the $455 filing and doc keting fees by collecting monthly payments from plaintiff's prison trust account until paid in full. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Varner Unit, P.O. Box 600, Grady, AR 71644-0600; the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, P.O. Box 8908, Pine Bluff, AR 71611, and the ADC Compliance Office, P.O. Box 20550, Pine Bluff, AR 71612-0550. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/24/11. (kpr)
May 4, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 125 Motion to Compel; denying 126 Motion for Reconsideration re 122 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/4/11. (kpr)
April 18, 2011 123 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 122 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the case with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/18/11. (kpr)
November 1, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 42 granting in part and denying in part Motion 29 Dismiss Case as Frivolous and dismissing, with prejudice, defts Greg Harmon, Ray Hobbs and Randy Watson; and denying the motion to 36 Dismiss Case as Frivolous filed by Kathy Stewart. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/1/10. (bkp)
September 27, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 56 Partial Report and Recommendations that 40 Motion for TRO filed by David Williams is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/27/10. (bkp)
May 25, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 9 Partial Report and Recommendations and dismissing plaintiff's claims against deft Norman Hodge and the Does with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/25/10. (bkp)
May 24, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for deft Kathy Stewart, and the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, complaint 2 , brief in support 4 , and this Order on deft Stewart, at the address provided UNDER SEAL, without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 5/24/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Stewart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?