Gates v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Ercil K Gates
Defendant: Ray Hobbs, Tom Ball, Bogan, L A Bell, Sackville, James Bell, Janice Buford, D Yarbrough, Wendy Kelley, Juanita Stell, Joseph Edward Hughes, Crystal Simms, Geraldine G Campbell and Jeffrey John Sherman
Case Number: 2:2010cv00077
Filed: June 8, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall Jr.
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2012 141 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 140 Order entered in this case, Gates's claims against Hobbs, Yarbrough, Kelley, Stell, Sims, Campbell, Shearman, Hughes, Ball, Sackville, and Buford are dismissed without prejudice. His claims against Bogan, Loretha A. Bell, and James Bell are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/30/2012. (dmn)
July 14, 2011 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 110 Partial Report and Recommendations granting in part and denying in part 91 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Loretha A Bell, James Bell, Janice Buford, Charlene Bogan, Marcus Sackville, Tom Ball. Plaintiff's cl aims against defts Ball, Sackville, and Buford are dismissed without prejudice. Gates may proceed with his claims for monetary damages against defts Bogan, Loretha Bell, and James Bell in their official capacities, and his claims for injunctive and declaratory relief against defts Bogan, Loretha Bell, and James Bell in their official capacities. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/14/11. (kpr)
January 21, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray's Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition; and granting 51 Defendant Shearman's motion to dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/21/11. (hph)
July 14, 2010 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge Ray's Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition; dismissing, without prejudice, Defendants Ray Hobbs, D. Yarbrough, Wendy Kelley, and Juanita Stell; and ordering service forthwith on Defendants Tom Ball, Bogan, L.A. Bell, Sackville, James Bell, Janice Buford, Joseph E Hughes, Crystal Simms, Geraldine G. Campbell, and Jeffrey J. Sherman. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/14/10. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gates v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ercil K Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L A Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sackville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Buford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita Stell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Edward Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geraldine G Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey John Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?