Lee v. Vann et al

Plaintiff: Frederick Lee
Defendant: Carl E Vann, Sr, Miguel B Casarez, Tundry R Wallace and Marlene Kalb
Case Number: 2:2010cv00097
Filed: July 20, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Johnson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Joint Motion for Dismissal with prejudice upon settlement. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/28/11. (vjt)
January 12, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information 11 . Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/12/11. (vjt)
August 24, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 2 5 Motions to Extend Time to Answer Complaint; Miguel B Casarez, Marlene Kalb, and Tundry R Wallace answer due 9/13/2010. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/24/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Vann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Lee
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl E Vann, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel B Casarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tundry R Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene Kalb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?