Booker v. Outlaw

Plaintiff: Aldrain Jeray Booker
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2010cv00100
Filed: July 20, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 20 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing the petition for writ of habeas corpus with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/8/10. (bkp)
November 16, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the petition for writ of habeas corpus be dismissed and the relief requested be denied 1 . Objections to R&R due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/16/2010. (lej)
July 21, 2010 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the petitioner to submit either the $5.00 statutory filing fee or a properly completed ifp application no later than 30 days after the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to immediately forward to petitioner an ifp application. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/21/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Booker v. Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldrain Jeray Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?