USA v. Lewis et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Ephron H Lewis, Doris J lewis, Lewis & Son Rice Processing Corporation, Enterprise Corporation of the Delta, Arkansas Land & Farm Development Corporation and Teel Marketing Services Inc
Case Number: 2:2010cv00105
Filed: July 23, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/30/12. (vjt)
October 19, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying separate defts' 13 Motion to Set Aside the Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/19/11. (vjt)
June 24, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of USA against Lewis & Son Rice Processing Corporation, Doris J Lewis, Ephron H Lewis in the principal sum of $ 645,518.35, plus interest in the sum of $126,132.51. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/24/11. (kpr)
May 20, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment; and, directing the United States to submit a precedent for judgment for the debt owed to plaintiff on the Borrower's promissory notes. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/20/2011. (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Lewis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Richard M. Pence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ephron H Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris J lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis & Son Rice Processing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Corporation of the Delta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Land & Farm Development Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teel Marketing Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?