Winnett v. Burls et al

Plaintiff: Donald Winnett
Defendant: Danny Burls, Cambell, Sims, C Davis, Wendy Kelly, Holloway, J Brown and Jane Doe
Case Number: 2:2010cv00106
Filed: July 26, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2012 197 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 196 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing Winnett's complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/26/12. (kpr)
October 14, 2011 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defts shall submit, no later than 14 days after the entry of this Order, a supplement to their 139 MOTION for Summary Judgment as directed; pltf shall file his response within 14 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 10/14/11. (vjt)
October 12, 2011 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER accepting in part and declining in part 160 Magistrate Judge Young's Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition; granting 136 Wendy Kelley's Motion for Summary Judgment; remanding 139 the remaining Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 154 , 167 and 172 Motions to Appoint Counsel; and, denying 170 Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/12/2011. (dmn)
May 9, 2011 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER if pltf wishes to file any further responses to defts' motions for summary judgment 136 139 , he must do so no later than 14 days after the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 5/9/11. (vjt)
March 13, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Judge H. David Young's Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition; granting 112 Winnett's motion to voluntarily dismiss two Defendants; dismissing Defendants Danny Burl and James Brown without prejudice; and directing the Clerk to remove these names as party Defendants. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/13/11. (hph)
November 22, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 31 Magistrate Judge Young's proposed findings and recommended disposition. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/22/10. (hph)
November 19, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, complaints 2 8 , and this Order on deft Walter Holloway (ADDRESS FILED UNDER SEAL) without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/19/10. (vjt)
October 27, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to reflect the correct name of deft Walter Holloway and to prepare summons for deft Holloway. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the complaint, this order, and summons upon deft Holloway without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 10/27/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winnett v. Burls et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Winnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?