Doe v. Gay et al

Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Andrew T Gay and Marianna Arkansas, City of
Case Number: 2:2010cv00109
Filed: August 4, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff has waived the jury trial and wishes to have the matter of damages tried to the Court. Therefore, this matter is rescheduled for bench trial on damages to begin at 1:30 p.m. on 3/19/2014, in Courtroom #314, United States Post Office and Courthouse Building, 617 Walnut Street, Helena, Arkansas. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/4/2014. (ks)
April 18, 2012 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE pending a decision by the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit on the appeal by pltf of the summary judgment entered in favor of the City of Marianna. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/18/12. (vjt)
April 3, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot the pending motions 41 43 45 47 filed by the City of Marianna. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/3/12. (vjt)
March 30, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part the City of Marianna's Motion for Summary Judgment 28 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/30/12. (vjt)
March 29, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion for John M. Zuck to Appear pro hac vice for pltf in this action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/29/12. (vjt)
March 22, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER giving notice that deft Andrew T. Gay will be dismissed from this action unless within seven days from the entry of this Order pltf shows good cause for failure to serve Gay with summons and complaint. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/22/12. (vjt)
February 15, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential information. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/15/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Gay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Thomas R. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew T Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marianna Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?