Reed v. Does

Plaintiff: Malich Reed
Defendant: Does
Case Number: 2:2010cv00159
Filed: October 12, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2012 90 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 89 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/7/12. (vjt)
July 25, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 43 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/25/11. (vjt)
July 7, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 38 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/7/11. (vjt)
November 23, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, complaints 2 5 , and this Order on defts Outlaw, Breckon, and Jemmot without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/23/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malich Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?