Fortune v. Outlaw

Plaintiff: Willie C Fortune
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2010cv00177
Filed: November 3, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 15 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/19/11. (bkp)
December 28, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS directing the Clerk to re-send the Report and Recommendations to Plaintiff at his new address in Ayer, MA. The plaintiff will have 14 days from the date of this Order to file objections to the Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 12/28/10. (bkp)
December 22, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that petitioner's petition be dismissed without prejudice 2 . The Court certify that an ifp appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Objections to R&R due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 12/22/2010. (lej)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fortune v. Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie C Fortune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?