Anderson v. Outlaw

Plaintiff: Steven Anderson
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2011cv00013
Filed: January 21, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 25, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 16 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this habeas action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/25/11. (vjt)
April 19, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 12 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this habeas action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/19/11. (vjt)
February 8, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER instructing the Clerk to serve the Petition 1 , Memorandum of Law in Support 2 & a copy of this Order on the Respondent & the U.S. Attorney by regular mail. The Court directs the Respondent to file an answer, motion or other responsive pleading to the Petition w/i 20 days after service of this Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 2/8/2011. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?