Collins v. Burl et al

Plaintiff: Tyrone L Collins
Defendant: D Burl, Ball, Crump, Polly M James and Janice Buford Gray
Case Number: 2:2011cv00040
Filed: March 1, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT Consistent with 66 the Order on Report and Recommendations that was entered this date, Collins's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/26/2013. (rhm)
April 19, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER referring the case back to Magistrate Judge Beth Deere, Discovery due by 8/2/2013; defts' motion for summary judgment due on or before 8/2/13. Collins's status report is due as soon as possible and no later than May 3, 2013. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/19/13. (kpr) (Docket entry modified on 4/19/2013 to remove the linkage.) (thd).
July 1, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that dispositive motions may be filed on or before October 28, 2011. The Clerk is directed to update the docket sheet to indicate the defendants' full names as indicated in their recently filed Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 7/1/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Burl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone L Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polly M James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Buford Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?