Champion v. Akin et al

Plaintiff: Jerry Champion
Defendant: Todd Ball, Danny Burl and Keshia Akin
Case Number: 2:2011cv00051
Filed: March 14, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2012 98 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 97 Order granting Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/22/2012. (dmn)
April 11, 2012 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Motion for Reconsideration re 67 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/11/12. (kpr)
March 19, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Lakeisha Akins; pltf shall file, within 30 days of the entry of this Order a response to deft's 73 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment, as directed. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/16/12. (vjt)
February 10, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 64 Partial Proposed Findings and Recommendations; granting 49 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing Defendants Ball and Burl without prejudice; and , dismissing the inadequate medical care claim Plaintiff has raised against Defendant Akin with prejudice. Defendants have thirty days from the entry of this Order to file any further dispositive motions. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/10/2012. (dmn)
April 25, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 Partial Report and Recommendations and directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for defts Akin, Burl, and Ball, and the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, Complaint, Amended Complaint, and this Order on them through the ADC Compliance Division, without prepayment of fees; and certifying that an ifp appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/25/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champion v. Akin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keshia Akin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?