Burns v. Kelley et al

Plaintiff: Roy D Burns
Defendant: Wendy Kelley, D Yarbough, Does and C Davis
Case Number: 2:2011cv00086
Filed: May 2, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 70 the proposed findings and recommended disposition; granting 66 Defendant Dottie Yarbrough's motion for summary judgment and dismissing 2 plaintiff Roy Burns' complaint, without prejudice. It is certified, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that an in forma pauperis appeal would be frivolous and would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/12/2012. (kdr)
December 29, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the proposed findings and recommended partial dispositions; dismissing Burns's claims against defendant Chiquita Davis, without prejudice; denying 37 Defendant Dottie Yarbrough's motion to dismiss; and dismissing Burns's claims against the Doe defendants, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/29/11. (hph)
September 20, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to provide, no later than 30 days after the entry of this Order, the names of the Doe Defendants, along with a brief statement of his claims against them. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/20/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Kelley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: KaTina Rena Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Yarbough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy D Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?