Watson v. Palestine-Wheatley School District No. 23 et al

Plaintiff: Sonya Watson
Defendant: Palestine-Wheatley School District No. 23, John Estes, James Smith, Vernon Thweatt, Derrick Boileau, Jimmy Cook, Gary Caldwell, Kevin Lawson and Jared Parker
Case Number: 2:2011cv00126
Filed: July 19, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Palestine-Wheatley School District No. 23, Derrick Boileau, Gary Caldwell, James Smith, Jared Parker, Jimmy Cook, John Estes, Kevin Lawson, Vernon Thweatt against Sonya Watson re 47 Jury Verdict. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/24/13. (kpr)
July 16, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re motions in limine 37 38 . Plaintiff's motion is granted and the parties and their counsel are directed to refrain from referring to certain evidence, testimony and argument, as set forth in this Order. Defendants' request to exclude as irrelevant any evidence of any settlement of any other civil rights case filed/and or pending against Palestine-Wheatley School District. The Court takes this issue under advisement during the pretrial. The Court will address this issue fu rther with counsel the morning of July 17,2013, and issue a ruling prior to trial. During the pretrial conference, counsel for plaintiff raised the issue of defendants eliciting expert testimony from certain witnesses listed in defendants pretrial disclosure sheet. The Court will rule on objections to such anticipated testimony as objections are made during the course of the trial. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/16/13. (kpr)
July 8, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER changing the 13 Scheduling Order to reflect that the trial scheduled to begin at 9:30 a.m. on July 15, 2013, in Courtroom #314, 617 Walnut Street, Helena, Arkansas, will now begin on Wednesday, July 17, 2013, at 9:30 a.m. in the same location. All other ddls set forth in the Final Scheduling Order remain in effect. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/8/13. (kpr)
June 20, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File 26 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying motion for summary judgment as untimely. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/20/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Palestine-Wheatley School District No. 23 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Watson
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palestine-Wheatley School District No. 23
Represented By: William Clay Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Estes
Represented By: William Clay Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Smith
Represented By: William Clay Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon Thweatt
Represented By: William Clay Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Boileau
Represented By: William Clay Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Cook
Represented By: William Clay Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Caldwell
Represented By: William Clay Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Lawson
Represented By: William Clay Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Parker
Represented By: William Clay Brazil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?