Kennedy v. United American Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Brenda Kennedy
Defendant: United American Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2011cv00131
Filed: July 29, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Cross
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 3, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion for Leave to File; denying 49 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/3/13. (kpr)
July 24, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying deft's 24 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/24/12. (vjt)
January 30, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY and Permitting Filing of Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/30/12. (vjt)
September 28, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 16 Stipulation of Dismissal of Certain Claims, pltf's claims set forth in Counts I, III, IV, V, VI, and VII of the complaint are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, and deft's 8 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/28/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. United American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United American Insurance Company
Represented By: William A. Waddell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Kennedy
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Stan P. Baudin
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Represented By: Casey P. Castleberry
Represented By: Alfred F. Tom Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?