Chestang v. Westbrook et al

Plaintiff: KeOndra M Chestang
Defendant: Valerie Westbrook and Steve Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2011cv00133
Filed: August 4, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2014 168 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 167 Order filed this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case with prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/18/2014. (ks)
April 22, 2013 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 112 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf is allowed to proceed to jury trial on his claim that he was denied access to the Court due to the confiscation of his property after his October 22, 2007, altercation with a guard; pltf's 108 Motion for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/22/13. (vjt)
January 9, 2013 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 97 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 91 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/9/13. (vjt)
July 16, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 77 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, deft's 68 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and pltf's 74 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/16/12. (vjt)
May 24, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 58 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 50 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/24/12. (vjt)
March 21, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot pltf's 41 Motion for Ruling on Motions to Dismiss; the motion is granted with respect to pltf's motion to lift the discovery stay, and the stay is lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 3/21/12. (vjt)
November 18, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 19 Motion for Default Judgment or Order to Show Cause; defts are directed to file a supplement to their motion to dismiss, which addresses the tolling issue, no later than 14 days after the entry of this Order; pltf is directed to file a response within 14 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 11/18/11. (vjt)
September 26, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, complaint 2 , and this Order on defts without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 9/26/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chestang v. Westbrook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KeOndra M Chestang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?