Cary v. USA

Plaintiff: J C Cary
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2011cv00140
Filed: August 9, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Woodruff
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of J C Cary against USA in the amount of $64,359.40 plus interest to the extent authorized by 31 U.S.C. § 1304. 54 . Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/20/13. (kpr)
May 3, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion to Change Venue from the Eastern Division of the Eastern District of Arkansas to the Western Division of the Eastern District of Arkansas. The trial in this matter will be held in Courtroom 4C at the Richard Sheppard Arnold U.S. Courthouse beginning at 9:30 a.m. on Monday, May 13, 2013. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 5/3/13. (kpr)
September 17, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/17/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cary v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J C Cary
Represented By: Darryl E. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?