Brown v. East Arkansas Community College

Plaintiff: Bernice L Brown
Defendant: East Arkansas Community College
Case Number: 2:2011cv00157
Filed: September 7, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: In accordance with the 29 Court's Order entered in this case on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/5/2012. (dmn)
September 7, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by East Arkansas Community College. Plaintiff's responses ddl is extended to 10/1/12. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to plaintiff at her address of record. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 9/7/12. (kpr)
September 21, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 7 ORDER denying at this time pltf's 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/21/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. East Arkansas Community College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice L Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Arkansas Community College
Represented By: Sherri L. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?