James v. Ball et al

Plaintiff: Donnie B James
Defendant: Wendy Kelley, Don Ball and Quible Butler
Case Number: 2:2011cv00161
Filed: September 12, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 64 the proposed findings and recommended disposition; granting 48 Defendants' motion for summary judgment; dismissing all of James' claims against defendants Stell and Corizon, Inc., without prejudice; dismissing, without prejudice, James' claim that defendants Butler and Ball provided him with inadequate medical care for tinnitus; dismissing, with prejudice, James' claims that defendants Butler and Ball provided him with inadequate medical care for his port-a-cath and neck/peripheral pain. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/5/2012. (kdr)
May 17, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 35 the proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; granting 31 Separate defendant Kelley's motion for summary judgment; and dismissing, without prejudice, defendant Kelley from this action. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/17/2012. (kdr)
February 10, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file, within 30 days a Response to 31 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to all claims against Wendy Kelley and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the Fed.R Civ.P, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/10/2012. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James v. Ball et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quible Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie B James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?