Collins v. Sledge et al

Plaintiff: Eugene Collins
Defendant: Valerie Westbrook, Don Sledge, Dottie Yarbrough, Juanita Stell and Robert Todd Ball
Case Number: 2:2011cv00167
Filed: September 20, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lincoln
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING in all respects 56 the Recommended Disposition; granting 40 Defendants Robert Todd Ball and Valerie Westbrook's motion for summary judgment; and dismissing with prejudice, Collins' claims against these defendants. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/9/2012. (kdr)
September 26, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 51 Partial Report and Recommendations granting Defendants Sledge and Yarbrough's 43 Motion for Summary Judgment. Mr Collin's claims against these defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/26/2012. (pag)
November 29, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's discrimination claim and his claims against deft Stell are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; pltf's claim that defts violated ADC policy is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/29/11. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Sledge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Sledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dottie Yarbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita Stell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Todd Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?