Parks v. Correctional Medical Services

Plaintiff: Derek Maurice Parks, Sr
Defendant: Corizon Inc
Case Number: 2:2011cv00199
Filed: November 4, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2014 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 134 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge. The 121 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendants Alisha Bell, Traci Ford and Renee Reese is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 2 Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with resp ect to his claims against Corizon Inc., Wendy Kelley, Renee Reese, Traci Ford and Alisha Bell, and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in all other respects. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the Order and Judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/5/2014. (mcz)
September 12, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 79 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/12/12. (vjt)
June 11, 2012 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 54 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's claims against defts Jones, Loe, Reed, and Does are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Christopher Loe, Reed, Does, and Jones terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/11/12. (vjt)
May 24, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 49 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, Kelley's Motion to Dismiss 41 is GRANTED; the claims against Wendy Kelley are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/24/12. (vjt)
May 14, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 46 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' motion to dismiss 29 is DENIED; pltf's motion for summary judgment, which was docketed as an objection to the report and recommendation 48 is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/14/12. (vjt)
February 13, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to correct name of deft Christopher Loe; the U.S. Marhsal is directed to serve summons, complaints 2 17 , and this Order on deft Loe (ADDRESS UNDER SEAL), without prepayment of fees and costs; pltf shall provide, no later than 30 days after the entry of this Order, a correct full name for the deft he has identified as Reed. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/13/12. (vjt)
January 10, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 12 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, 6 Motion to Dismiss filed by deft Corizon Inc is GRANTED, and pltf's claims against Corizon Inc are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; pltf's 11 Motion to Amend is GRANTED; the Clerk is directed to file entry 11-1 as pltf's amended complaint, and to add as defts Jones and Doe; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaints 2 11 , and this Order on deft Jones without prepayment of fees and costs; Corizon Inc terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/10/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks v. Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Maurice Parks, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Inc
Represented By: Brent Jay Eubanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?