Brinkley v. Helena-West Helena, Arkansas et al

Plaintiff: Doretha Brinkley
Defendant: Mike Hall, Helena-West Helena, Arkansas, Arnell Willis and James Valley
Case Number: 2:2011cv00207
Filed: November 14, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 77 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. This action will proceed to trial solely against Mikel Hall in his individual capacity. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/21/2014. (ks)
October 22, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot the motion of Brinkley to disqualify counsel 33 ; denying the motion of Brinkley to strike defendants' motions to set aside entry of default 33 ; denying Brinkley's motion to strike or limit the Declaration of Arnell Willis 35 , and granting the motions of the City of Helena-West Helena and Hall to set aside entry of default 27 29 ; Mayor Willis and former Mayor Valley are given twenty (20) days from the date of entry of this Order in which to file a motion for an extension of time pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 6(b)(1)(B) to file an answer or other responsive pleading to Brinkley's complaint; Brinkley is given twenty (20) days from the date of entry of this Order in which to properly serve the City of Helena-West Helena and Hall. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/22/12. (vjt)
September 5, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 request to substitute Mary Robin Casteel as counsel of record for defts in place of Chalk S. Mitchell. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/5/12. (vjt)
June 28, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for Drayton D. Berkley to Appear pro hac vice for pltf. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/28/12. (vjt)
June 14, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 13 Motion for Default Judgment against the City of Helena-West Helena and Mike (or Mikel) Hall; prior to entering judgment, however, the Court must have a hearing on the amount of pltf's damages; the Court will schedule that hearing by separate Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/14/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brinkley v. Helena-West Helena, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helena-West Helena, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnell Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doretha Brinkley
Represented By: Paul N. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?