Chatman v. Burl et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Ray Chatman
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services, Strickland, Ball, Danny Burl and Green
Case Number: 2:2011cv00216
Filed: November 28, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 57 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/11/12. (vjt)
May 21, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 31 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 25 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and defts Burl and Green are DISMISSED from pltf's complaint without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/21/12. (vjt)
April 11, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to file a response to the 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Danny Burl, Green within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/11/12. (kpr)
January 17, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for the deft Dr. Don Ball and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and complaint on deft at the address provided under seal, without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/17/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chatman v. Burl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Medical Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Represented By: James O. Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green
Represented By: James O. Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ray Chatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?