Cincoski v. Burl et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Lee Cincoski
Defendant: Danny Burl, R T Ball and Payne
Case Number: 2:2011cv00241
Filed: December 27, 2011
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 62 the proposed findings and recommended disposition; and granting 52 Defendants' motion for summary judgment and dismissing plaintiff's complaint, with prejudice. It is further certified that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/24/2013. (kdr)
May 4, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 20 the proposed findings and recommended disposition; and denying 12 Plaitniff's motion for injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/4/12. (hph)
April 12, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 13 the proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; and denying 9 defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/12/12. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cincoski v. Burl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lee Cincoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Burl
Represented By: Ali M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R T Ball
Represented By: Ali M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payne
Represented By: Ali M. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?