Jeffers et al v. Beebe et al

Plaintiff: Future Mae Jeffers, Mary Jeffers, Henry Peacock, Shirley Harvell, Ronald Williams, Peggy R Wright, Laura Love, Frank Shaw, C W Campbell, Leo Chitman, Etta Campbell, Plez Lucas, Vickie Robertson, Joseph Perry, Elbert Smith, Sandra Bagley, Nikki Dismuke, Alice W Valley, Laketha Brown Fluker, Katrina Harrell, Chester Harrell, Eddie O'Neal, Christopher Franklin and Jack Bernard Crumbly
Defendant: Mike Beebe, Mark Martin, Dustin McDaniel and Arkansas Board of Apportionment
Case Number: 2:2012cv00016
Filed: January 23, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1973
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Before Three Judge Panel, District Judge Holmes, Circuit Judge Smith, and Distict Judge Wright granting 97 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Appeal filed by Dustin McDaniel, Mike Beebe, and Arkansas Board of Apportionment. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/13/2013. (mcz)
September 17, 2012 94 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT Before Three Judge Panel District Judge Holmes, Circuit Judge Smith, and District Judge Wright, pursuant to 93 Opinion entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendants, dismissing plaintiffs' complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Lavenski R. Smith on 9/17/12. (vjt)
May 29, 2012 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltfs' 86 Motion to Enjoin the Certification of the Election Results in State Senate District 24. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/29/12. (vjt)
May 11, 2012 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltfs' request for an injunction postponing the primary election for Arkansas Senate District 24, which is the subject of this lawsuit, as well as Senate Districts 22 and 23, until the date of the general election, November 6, 2012. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/11/12. (vjt)
May 3, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Peter S. Wattson and Nathan Andrew Bagley to bring electronic devices into the courthouse in Helena from 5/7/12 through 5/11/12. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/3/12. (vjt)
May 1, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defts' motions for summary judgment 55 65 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/1/12. (vjt)
April 23, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING COURTROOM AND MEDIA PROTOCOL for Trial scheduled for May 7, 2012 in Helena. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/23/12. (vjt)
April 5, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion to Dismiss filed by Governor Mike Beebe and Attorney General Dustin McDaniel. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/5/12. (vjt)
March 16, 2012 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 40 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order; the deadline for filing dispositive motions and Daubert motions is 4/13/12. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/16/12. (vjt)
March 7, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltfs' 29 Motion for Discovery to Depose Party Opponents. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/7/12. (vjt)
March 1, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DESIGNATION NUNC PRO TUNC, that Circuit Judge Lavenski R. Smith and District Judge Susan Webber Wright shall serve on a three-judge panel in this case effective as of February 3, 2012, and for as long as necessary to complete this case. Signed by Chief Judge William Jay Riley on 3/1/12. (vjt)
February 27, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltfs' 18 Motion to Amend Complaint; pltfs must file their amended complaint within seven days from the entry of this Order; denying 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/27/12. (vjt)
February 3, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the claimants request for a three-judge panel; the parties shall submit a report by 12:00 noon on 2/10/12 as directed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/3/12. (vjt)
January 25, 2012 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to submit briefs on the issue of whether the pltfs are entitled to a three-judge panel; pltfs' brief is due no later than 5:00 p.m. on 1/31/12; defts' brief, if they oppose a three-judge panel, must be filed by 5:00 p.m. on 2/3/12; the Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Honorable Dustin McDaniel, Attorney General for the State of Arkansas, by CM/ECF and by facsimile. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/25/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffers et al v. Beebe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Future Mae Jeffers
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Jeffers
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Peacock
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Harvell
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Williams
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy R Wright
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Love
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Shaw
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C W Campbell
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Chitman
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etta Campbell
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plez Lucas
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie Robertson
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Perry
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elbert Smith
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Bagley
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki Dismuke
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice W Valley
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laketha Brown Fluker
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Harrell
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Harrell
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie O'Neal
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Franklin
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Bernard Crumbly
Represented By: J. F. Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Beebe
Represented By: Warren Taylo Readnour
Represented By: David A. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Martin
Represented By: W. Asa Hutchinson
Represented By: Kristi Hunter
Represented By: W. Asa Hutchinson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin McDaniel
Represented By: David A. Curran
Represented By: Warren Taylo Readnour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Board of Apportionment
Represented By: David A. Curran
Represented By: Warren Taylo Readnour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?