May v. USA et al

Plaintiff: Loren W May, Sr
Defendant: Does, T C Outlaw and Ronald Smith
Case Number: 2:2012cv00019
Filed: January 25, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 25 Memorandum and Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, DISMISSED with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/2/2012. (dmn)
May 24, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by T C Outlaw, Ronald Smith. The Court will construe this motion as a motion for summary judgment and will direct the parties to file any additional relevant exhibits, briefs, and/or affidavits in support of the parties' respective positions within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/24/12. (kpr)
February 22, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the proposed findings and recommended partial disposition; and dismissing Defendants United States of America, Maldonado, and Wats from May's complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/22/12. (hph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren W May, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?