Newton v. Outlaw

Plaintiff: Dameyon Antoine Newton
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Case Number: 2:2012cv00023
Filed: February 6, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 21 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/17/12. (vjt)
July 5, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 21 MOTION for Reconsideration re 20 Judgment, 19 Memorandum Order filed by Dameyon Antoine Newton. Respondent is given up to and including July 16, 2012, to file a response to plaintiff's motion for reconsideration and accompanying brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 7/5/12. (kpr)
February 22, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to serve a copy of the petition and this Order on the respondent and the U.S. Attorney by regular mail; the respondent will respond to the petition within 21 days of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge H. David Young on 2/22/12. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newton v. Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dameyon Antoine Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?