Manuel v. MDOW Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Kirk Manuel
Defendant: MDOW Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv00035
Filed: February 28, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 72 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 07/29/2014. (rhm)
April 24, 2014 70 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of MDOW Insurance Company against Kirk Manuel. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/24/2014. (mmd)
January 23, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 plaintiff's second motion to compel. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/23/2013. (thd)
August 30, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Withdraw and withdrawing 17 Motion for Contempt. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 8/30/12. (kpr)
April 27, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion to Dismiss the bad-faith claim without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/27/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manuel v. MDOW Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Manuel
Represented By: Everett O. Martindale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDOW Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Steven Breeding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?