Russell v. Breedlove et al

Plaintiff: David Russell
Defendant: Breedlove, Skrapates, Crystal Sims and Wendy Kelly
Case Number: 2:2012cv00107
Filed: June 11, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge that 5 Defendant Wendy Kelly be dismissed from this action with prejudice. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from this order is considered frivilous and not in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/19/2012. (mcz)
August 29, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for the defts Crystal Sims and Andrea Breedlove, and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons and the Amended Complaint on defts at the addresses provided under seal without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/29/12. (kpr)
August 2, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for defts Breedlove, Skrapates, Sims, and Campbell. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve defts a copy of the summons and Amended Complaint without prepayment of costs therefor in care of Humphries & Lewis Law Firm, P.O. Box 20670, White Hall, AR 71612. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/2/12. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Breedlove et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skrapates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?