Williams v. Phillips Hospital Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Al M Williams
Defendant: Phillips Hospital Corporation and Arthur Levy
Case Number: 2:2012cv00168
Filed: August 15, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 105 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 104 Order granting defts' motions for summary judgment and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/13/13. (kpr)
January 30, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Defendant Phillips Hospital Corporation's Motion to Deem Admitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/30/2013. (kcs)
January 24, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 separate Defendant Levy's Motion to Deem Admitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/24/2013. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Phillips Hospital Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips Hospital Corporation
Represented By: Travis J. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Levy
Represented By: David A. Littleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al M Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?