Hastings v. May et al

Plaintiff: Michael Hastings
Defendant: Stanley Barnes, Jonnie Jones, Otis Smith and Bobby May
Case Number: 2:2012cv00200
Filed: October 2, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 62 the proposed findings and recommendations; granting in part 56 defendants' motion for summary judgment; dismissing, with prejudice, plaintiff's allegations against defendants Barnes and Jones, and dismissing Barnes and Jones as defendants; dismissing, with prejudice, plaintiff's medical allegations against defendant Smith; and allowing plaintiff's failure to protect and retaliation claim against defendant Smith to remain pending. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/28/2013. (kdr)
March 13, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 36 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; and denying 19 Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/13/2013. (kdr)
December 28, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 13 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; dismissing Defendant May for plaintiff's failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted; dismissing the allegation of failure to protect on 11/14/2009, against defendant Smith; and dismissing monetary claims against defendants in their official capacities. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/28/2012. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hastings v. May et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonnie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?