Crawford v. Peikar et al

Plaintiff: Jeffery L Crawford
Defendant: C Harding, W Resto, Misty Rios, D Heuett, Timothy C Outlaw, Darlene Gallardo, Kenneth Brown, R Langley, Kavin Ward, Henein T Iskander, Brenda Hoy, Stephanie McCay, Mary Roberts, Pamela Taylor-Mustion, Kathleen Maples, Nader Peikar and Rivers Graham
Case Number: 2:2012cv00224
Filed: November 13, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 112 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge. Defendants' 97 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and this case is DISMISSED, with prejudice. The Court CERTIFIES that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/29/2014. (mcz)
January 15, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 95 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Interrogatories. All of the requests made in Plaintiff's Response to the 11/12/2013 Order 96 are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/15/2014. (kcs)
January 7, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file, within 30 days, a Response to 97 MOTION to Dismiss and alternatively, for summary judgment filed by Kathleen Maples, Kenneth Brown, Michelle Wingo, Denese Heuett, Timothy C Outlaw, Nader Peikar, Darlene Gallardo, Kevin Ward, Mary Ellen Rivers-Graham, Brenda Hoy, Mary Roberts, Stephanie McCay, that comply with the Fed. R. Civ. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions set forth in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to timely an d properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 56.1(c); or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/07/2014. (kcs)
October 17, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 74 Partial Report and Recommendation; therefore, pltf's 65 Motion for Permanent Injunction is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/17/13. (vjt)
September 3, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 69 Plaintiff's Motion for Change of Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 09/03/2013. (kcs)
July 11, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 63 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, pltf's 55 Motion for Outside Medical Treatment, which has been construed as a Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, is DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/11/13. (vjt)
June 28, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 58 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, separate defts Rios's and Resto-Rivera's Motion to Dismiss 50 is GRANTED, and they are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this lawsuit. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/28/13. (vjt)
January 3, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, Michelle Wingo is added as a deft; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaints 2 5 , and this Order on defts Peikar, Graham, Hoy, McCay, Roberts, Heu ett, Outlaw, Gallardo, Brown, Ward, Resto, Rios, Maples, and Wingo, and the U.S. Attorney's Office and the U.S. Attorney General, without prepayment of fees and costs; all other claims and defts are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/3/13. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Peikar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Resto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Heuett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy C Outlaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Gallardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kavin Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henein T Iskander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie McCay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Taylor-Mustion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Maples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nader Peikar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rivers Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery L Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?