Onstad v. Wilkinson et al

Plaintiff: Alan Cole Onstad
Defendant: Richard L Proctor and Mary Ann Wilkinson
Case Number: 2:2013cv00004
Filed: January 11, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 18, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 16 Order entered in this case, Onstad's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/18/2013. (dmn)
March 13, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion for Reconsideration re 8 Order and 9 Judgment. The Court vacates its 2/7/13 Judgment and vacates part of its Order, asssessing a strike and dismissing with prejudice. The rest of the Order stands. The Court grants Onstad until 4/10/13 to file an amended complaint. His request for court-appointed counsel is denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/13/13. (kpr)
February 7, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 8 Order dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/7/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Onstad v. Wilkinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Cole Onstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?