Cameron Mutual Insurance Company v. Lewellen et al

Plaintiff: Cameron Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Roy Lewellen and Doris Lewellen
Counter_defendant: Cameron Mutual Insurance Company
Counter_claimant: Doris Lewellen and Roy Lewellen
Case Number: 2:2013cv00017
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The Court notes the parties' stipulation of dismissal, 67 . All claims and counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/26/2014. (jak)
October 20, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER congratulating the parties on settlement. The 26 Scheduling Order is suspended. The upcoming pretrial and trial are cancelled. All pending motions are denied without prejudice as moot. The Court will dismiss the case with prejudice unless a party seeks some relief before 21 November 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/20/2014. (jak)
September 16, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. The Lewellens' bad faith claim is dismissed with prejudice. Their contract claim remains for the Jury. The parties should get ready for trial on 3 November 2014 in Helena. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/16/2014. (jak)
August 25, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 48 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/25/2014. (jak)
January 6, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 28 Motion to Compel. If Cameron will not confer in person (by telephone given the distance) or participate in filing a joint report by 13 January 2014, then the Lewellens may file a report alone, and the Court will act on it. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/6/2014. (jak)
January 23, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss; granting 11 Defendant's Motion to Change Venue to Helena, Arkansas. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/2013. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cameron Mutual Insurance Company v. Lewellen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Cameron Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy J. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Lewellen
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Lewellen
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Doris Lewellen
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Roy Lewellen
Represented By: B. Michael Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?