Quinones v. USA

Plaintiff: Guillermo Quinones
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2013cv00019
Filed: January 25, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Phillips
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Quinones must pay the full $505 filing fee with an initial partial filing fee of $55 assessed. Future monthly payments should be obtained from the prison trust account of Mr. Quinones and forwarded to the Clerk of Court. The Court directs the Clerk to send a copy of this Order to the Warden, Forrest City Low Federal Correctional Institution. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/11/2014. (jak)
January 30, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/30/2014. (mmd)
October 24, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice as moot 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/24/2013. (srw)
June 4, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 11 Partial Report and Recommendations with one slight modification; deft's 8 Motion to Dismiss is denied without prejudice; the Clerk is directed to issue summons and mail them to pltf today; pltf must serve the United States as directed by 7/1/13. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/4/13. (vjt)
April 3, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery. Plaintiff's Motion to submit discovery requests to Defendants is GRANTED. Plaintiff's request for counsel is DENIED without prejudice, and Plaintiff's Motion to take depositions and consult with medical experts is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/3/2013. (srw)
February 12, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees; and directing the Clerk of the Court to forward Plaintiff an Application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 2/12/2013. (srw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quinones v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillermo Quinones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?