Bell v. Burl et al

Plaintiff: Joe Leonard Bell, Jr
Defendant: D Burl, Jermy C Andrews and Curtis L Rolfe, III
Case Number: 2:2013cv00054
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Bell's remaining claim against Andrews without prejudice for failure to prosecute. The pending motions, 92 & 93 are denied as moot. Mr. Rosenzweig is relieved as counsel with the Court's thanks. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/18/2015. (jak)
November 3, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on counsel's motion to continue and motion to withdraw, 93 , at 11:00 a.m. on Wednesday, 18 November 2015. The hearing will be held in Courtroom B-155 of the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse. Bell must appear. If he fails to appear, then his claims against Andrews will be dismissed without prejudice. The Court directs both the Clerk and Bell's lawyer to send a copy of this Order to Bell's last known address. Bell's lawyer must also send a copy of the Order to all alternate addresses he has for Bell and if he has an address for the man he believes may be Bell's son, he shall send a copy to Bell care of Joe Leonard Bell III as well. If Bell appears at the 18 November 2015 hearing, then the Court will take up counsel's motion, 93 , Andrews's motion in limine, 92 , and other pretrial matters at the hearing. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/3/2015. (jak)
September 22, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 67 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition in full. 49 Motion for Summary Judgment granted in part and denied in part. All Bell's claims against Burl are dismissed without prejudice based on no exhaustion. Bell' s retaliatory-discipline and inadequate-care claims against Andrews are dismissed with prejudice. Bell's retaliatory-assignment claim remains for trial. A Scheduling Order will issue setting trial for 13 July 2015. Judge Ray should appoint counsel to try the case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/22/2014. (jak)
February 25, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying, as moot, 55 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; granting 57 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to 49 Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff is directed to file a Response that complies with the instructions in the 2/5/2015 Order on or before 3/27/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/25/2014. (kcs)
February 5, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days a Response to 49 and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with the Fed. R. Civ. P. 56, Local Rule 56.1, and the instructions set forth in this Order. Plaintiff is advised that failu re to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 56.1(c); or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Local Rule 5.5(c)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/05/2014. (kcs)
January 30, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Plaintiff's Motion for a Subpoena which has been construed as a Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/30/2014. (kcs)
January 21, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Defendants to file on or before 1/28/2014, a Response to 41 MOTION for Issuance of a Subpoena filed by Joe Leonard Bell, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/21/2014. (kcs)
December 11, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, as modified; granting 37 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/11/2013. (kcs)
October 29, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing plaintiff's claims against Rolfe without prejudice. An ifp appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/29/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Burl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Leonard Bell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermy C Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis L Rolfe, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?