Anderson et al v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Cleo Anderson and Dotty Anderson
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv00087
Filed: June 27, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2015 164 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 163 Opinion and Order entered separately today, judgment is entered in favor of Cleo and Dotty Anderson against Shelter Mutual Insurance Company for attorneys' fees in the amount of $50,000.00 and costs in the amount of $4,571.65, for a total judgment of $54,571.65, with post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.25% per annum, for all of which judgment and execution may issue. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/5/2015. (ks)
March 19, 2015 149 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in favor of Cleo Anderson and Dotty Anderson in the amount of $68,911.93 plus $8,269.43 (which represents 12% damages upon the amount of the loss) plus post-judgment interest to accrue at the rate of 0.25% per annum from the date of the entry of this Judgment until the date the Judgment is satisfied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 03/19/2015. (rhm)
March 12, 2015 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER determining that the jury trial in this case will begin at 10:30 a.m. on Monday, March 16, 2015, in Courtroom #314, in Helena, Arkansas. Counsel should be present by 10:00 a.m. to take up pretrial matters. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/12/2015. (jak)
January 20, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court has been notified that the parties have stipulated that the motion deadline for depositions allowed pursuant to a recent Order of the Court will be February 13, 2015. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/20/2015. (ks)
December 29, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion for Extension. The depositions of persons whose depositions were previously requested may be conducted at the convenience of the parties and witnesses any time up to and including February 6, 2015. Otherwise, the motion for an extension of the discovery deadline is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/29/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleo Anderson
Represented By: Louis A. Etoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dotty Anderson
Represented By: Louis A. Etoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles W. Lyford
Represented By: John E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?