Roberts v. Arkansas Military Department et al

Plaintiff: Denicia V Roberts
Defendant: Arkansas Military Department, William Johnson and Ray Moix
Case Number: 2:2013cv00091
Filed: July 9, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's 83 motion to dismiss. The complaint of Denicia V. Roberts against the Arkansas Military Department and William Johnson is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/12/2016. (ljb)
June 17, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Third Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. All of Roberts's claims are dismissed, except her Title VII hostile work environment claim against the Arkansas Military Department and her official-capacity section 198 3 claim against Johnson for declaratory and prospective injunctive relief. Those claims will proceed. Roberts's other claims against the Arkansas Military Department under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 and the Arkansas Civil Rights Act are dismissed with prejudice. Her retaliation claims under Title VII and her individual capacity claims against Ray Moix are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/17/2014. (ks)
March 12, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Dismiss. Roberts must file an amended complaint within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/12/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Arkansas Military Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denicia V Roberts
Represented By: Anthony Bryce Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Military Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Moix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?