Stiger v. USA

Plaintiff: Thomas Harold Stiger
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2013cv00110
Filed: August 28, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 03/06/2014. (rhm)
February 12, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file a Reply to the Defendant's 31 Response, within 10 days of the date of this Order, including the reason(s) for the delay in filing the Summary Judgment Response. Failure to timely file this Reply shall result in the denial of the Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 2/12/2014. (mmd)
January 17, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 24 Memorandum and Order dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/17/14. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stiger v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Harold Stiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?