May v. Haynes et al

Plaintiff: Loren W May, Sr
Defendant: Ron Smith, A Haynes and Does
Case Number: 2:2013cv00127
Filed: September 30, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Pursuant to the 48 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 10/31/2014. (ks)
April 8, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to file within 30 days a Response to 29 MOTION to Dismiss and alternatively, motion for summary judgment filed by A Haynes, Ron Smith, Hay, Graham and a separate Statement of Disputed Facts that comply with t he Local Rules and the instructions set forth in this order. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to timely and properly comply with this Order will result in: (a) all of the facts in Defendants' summary judgment papers being deemed admitted by Plaintiff; or (b) the dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 04/08/2014. (kcs) (Docket text modified on 4/8/2014 to correct a typographical error).(jak)
March 6, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/06/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: May v. Haynes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren W May, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?