Southeast Arkansas Hospice Inc v. Department of Health and Human Services

Plaintiff: Southeast Arkansas Hospice Inc
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 2:2013cv00134
Filed: October 9, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 45 Opinion and Order that was entered on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 03/26/2015. (rhm)
June 11, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 27 SEARK's second motion for a temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 06/11/2014. (rhm)
February 20, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 8 motion for temporary restraining order or preliminary injunction, to stay collection of all demands for repayment, pending final adjudication. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/20/2014. (mmd)
January 21, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction filed by Southeast Arkansas Hospice Inc. The Court will conduct a preliminary injunction hearing, which will be set by separate order. Plaintiff's motion remains pending. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/21/14. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southeast Arkansas Hospice Inc v. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeast Arkansas Hospice Inc
Represented By: Don E. Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?