Spears v. Hughes et al

Plaintiff: James Spears, Jr
Defendant: Jeffrey Hughes, Mitchell Sparkman, Maurel, Renae Mayo, Pinkie Hill and Speedy
Case Number: 2:2014cv00002
Filed: January 3, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2017 171 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT for James Spears, Jr., against Jeffrey Hughes for $27,560. Spears is entitled to $11,600, which represents his costs and his damages, reduced by the 25% of those damages that he must pay toward his attorney's fee . Spears's lawyer is entitled to $15,960, which represents his costs and his total fee. This Amended Judgment shall accrue post-judgment interest at 0.81 % per annum from 3/3/2017 (the date of the original Judgment) until paid in full. 28 U.S.C. § 1961 (a)-(b). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/4/2017. (jak)
March 3, 2017 163 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Spears on his excessive-force claim against Hughes. James Spears, Jr., shall have judgment against Jeffrey Hughes for $15,000 and this judgment shall bear interest at 0.81% per annum until paid in full. Spears's appointed lawyer is also entitled to a reasonable attorney's fee and Spears is entitled to costs, as allowed by law. Any motion for fees and costs due by 3/17/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/3/2017. (jak)
April 12, 2016 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 146 Motion. The Court directs the Clerk to enter a default against Hughes. The Court will hold a jury trial at 9:30 a.m. on 27 February 2017 in Little Rock. The Court will enter an Amended Final Scheduling Order soon. Any motion to amend must be filed by 25 April 2016. The Court directs counsel for Spears to send a copy of this Order to Hughes's last known address. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/12/2016. (jak)
April 3, 2016 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court would appreciate a status report or appropriate motion from Spears by 11 April 2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/3/2016. (jak)
October 6, 2015 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing with prejudice defendants Sparkman, Merrell, Mayo, Hill, and Speed pursuant to the parties' settlement agreement. Spears's motion to withdraw, 131 , is granted. And his declaration of objections and motion, 130 , is denied as moot. Spears can't file any more papers because he has a lawyer. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/6/2015. (jak)
August 19, 2015 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court congratulates Spears, Sparkman, Merrell, Mayo, Hill and Speed on their settlement. The Final Scheduling Order is suspended; and the 14 September 2015 trial is cancelled, 95 & 99 . The Court will dismiss the case with prejudice as to the five settling Defendants unless some party requests relief before 18 September 2015. Because it's not clear that Hughes was properly served, the Court vacates the Clerk's default, 58 . The Court reopens the time for Spears to serve Hughes until 17 December 2015. The Court has appointed counsel for Spears. He can and should handle service of process now. The Court directs the Clerk to provide counsel with Hughes's last known address, which is under seal, 10 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/19/2015. (jak)
May 12, 2015 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Unopposed recommendation, 108 , adopted. Motion for injunctive relief, 107 , denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/12/2015. (jak)
January 12, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 85 Recommendation. Motion for summary judgment, 70 denied. There are issues of material fact that remain for a jury. A Scheduling Order with trial date will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/12/2015. (jak)
July 30, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Motion to Withdraw. His original motion, 50 , is withdrawn, and Magistrate Judge Young's recommendation, 51 , is declined as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/30/2014. (jak)
June 19, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion for Reconsideration. Magistrate Judge H. David Young's order denying Spears's motion to compel is not clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/19/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spears v. Hughes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Spears, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Sparkman
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renae Mayo
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinkie Hill
Represented By: Renae Ford Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?