Rayburn v. Burl

Plaintiff: Jesse James Rayburn
Defendant: Burl
Case Number: 2:2014cv00007
Filed: January 21, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 68 Motion to Appoint counsel. The Court adopts the recommendation, 65 , and overrules Rayburn's objections 69 . Heath and Larry's motion for summary judgment, 50 , is granted. Rayburn's claims against them in their individual capacities will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/14/2015. (jak)
December 14, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Rayburn's claims against Burl and Sidney Larry are dismissed without prejudice. Rayburn's claims against Heath in his official capacity are dismissed without prejudice. Rayburn's claims against Heath and Lenny Larry in their individual capacities are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/14/2015. (jak)
October 6, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting as supplemented 29 Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition. The 22 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant Sidney Larry had no involvement with the alleged incident. He is therefore dismis sed without prejudice. Rayburn's claims against Heath in his official capacity are dismissed without prejudice. 30 Motion to Amend is granted. The Clerk shall docket 30 as a Supplement to the 8 Amended Complaint. Lenny Larry should be added as a defendant and Larry and Heath should be named in their individual capacities. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/6/2014. (jak)
March 10, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Corporal Larry and Lieutenant Heath. The Court directs the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, a copy of Rayburn's complaint as amended, 2 and 8 , and this Order on each of them through the AD C Compliance Office. If either Larry or Heath is no longer an ADC employee, then the ADC Compliance Office must file with the Court the unserved defendant's last known private mailing address under seal. The Court dismisses Rayburn's claims against Warden Burl without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/10/2014. (jak)
January 22, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/22/2014. (kcs) Docket text modified on 1/22/2014 to correct typographical error. (kbc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rayburn v. Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse James Rayburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?