Simpson v. FCC Forrest City

Plaintiff: Michael Dale Simpson
Defendant: FCC Forrest City
Case Number: 2:2014cv00031
Filed: March 4, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 75 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/29/2014. (ks)
October 9, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 56 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 34 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/9/2014. (ks)
July 15, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 20 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/15/2014. (ks)
May 16, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER declining to adopt 5 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. The Court directs service of summons and complaint by the United States Marshals Service upon the United States Attorney, the Attorney General, and the Warden of the Federal Correc tional Complex. The Court also directs the Clerk of Court to provide a copy of this Order to Richard Pence, Chief of the Civil Division for the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Arkansas, and the Court orders the United States to respond to Simpson's request for a preliminary injunction on or before May 30, 2014. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/16/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. FCC Forrest City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCC Forrest City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dale Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?