Powell v. Graham et al

Plaintiff: Billy Glenn Powell
Defendant: Judy G Graham and Furniture Brands International Inc
Case Number: 2:2014cv00032
Filed: March 7, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/12/2017. (jak)
June 12, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Addendum, 38 , noted and appreciated. 36 Motion to substitute is granted. The Estate of Billy Glen Powell, by Sharon Powell, special administrator, is substituted for Billy Glenn Powell as plaintiff. The Court directs the Clerk to update the docket. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/12/2017. (jak)
June 8, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Unopposed motion to substitute, No. 36 , noted. Sharon Powell should file an addendum with her acceptance of appointment as special administrator and Arkansas letters of administration. Addendum due by 6/15/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/8/2017. (jak)
June 9, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 3 MOTION to Extend Time. Powell's time for taking any steps in this case, including service, is extended by operation of law until thirty days after notice of termination of the stay. The Court administratively terminates this case subject to timely reopening when the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/9/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Graham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Glenn Powell
Represented By: John Irving Houseal, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy G Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furniture Brands International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?