White v. USA

Plaintiff: Paul A White
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 2:2014cv00060
Filed: April 28, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 45 Recommended Disposition. The United States' 20 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. White's complaint will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/28/2016. (mcz)
November 30, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion. The motion is timely under the mailbox rule. The Court vacates its 27 October 2015 Order and Judgment, 40 and 41 , and directs the Clerk to reinstate the United States' motion for summary judgment, 20 . The Court refers this case back to Magistrate Judge Ray for further proceedings and a recommendation. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/30/2015. (jak)
October 27, 2015 41 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: White's complaint and amended complaint are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/27/2015. (jak)
May 1, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/01/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?