Strange v. USA et al

Plaintiff: Calvin D Strange, Jr
Defendant: USA, Bureau of Prisons, C V Rivera, Rincon, Brenda Hoy, Michelle Wingo and Doe
Case Number: 2:2014cv00078
Filed: June 20, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from the Order and Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/9/2015. (jak)
December 18, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 14 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; allowing Plaintiff to proceed with his inadequate medical care claims against defendants Hoy and Wingo; dismissing, without prejudice, Plaintiff's claims against Defe ndants United States of America, Bureau of Prisons, CV Rivera, Rincon, and Doe, for failure to state a claim; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and the accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/18/2014. (kdr)
October 15, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 7 order entered this day, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/15/2014. (ks)
August 7, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to notify the Clerk of his current address within 30 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is advised that failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of his Complaint without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 08/07/2014. (kcs)
June 23, 2014 3 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 06/23/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strange v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin D Strange, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C V Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rincon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Wingo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?