Coleman v. Woodard

Plaintiff: Delwrick Coleman
Defendant: Benjamin R Woodard
Case Number: 2:2014cv00087
Filed: July 14, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 67 the proposed findings and recommended disposition in their entirety; granting 46 Defendant's motion for summary judgment; dismissing plaintiff's complaint, without prejudice, with respect to his state law claims, and dismissing with prejudice in all other respects; denying 54 Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from the order and judgment dismissing this action is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/17/2015. (kdr)
February 2, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 41 the Partial Recommended Disposition in its entirety; and denying 34 the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/2/2015. (kdr)
October 6, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 16 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety in all respects; denying 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/6/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delwrick Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin R Woodard
Represented By: Nga Mahfouz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?