Ellis v. Haynes

Plaintiff: Anthony Ellis
Defendant: Anthony Haynes
Case Number: 2:2014cv00094
Filed: July 25, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Out of State
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 37 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Defendants' 26 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/5/2016. (mcz)
November 21, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 12 Partial Proposed Findings and Recommendations. Defendants Haynes, Kayne, Hoy, Graham, Ward and Cook are DISMISSED, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/21/2014. (mcz)
October 28, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that service is appropriate for the Defendant Anthony Haynes; directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for the Defendant; and directing the US Marshall to serve a copy of the 2 Complaint and summons on Defendant Haynes, the US Attorney and the US Attorney General without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/28/2014. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?