Dykes v. Corizon Health Inc et al

Plaintiff: James Randall Dykes
Defendant: Corizon Health Inc, Nwannem Ucoamaka Obi-okoye, Bernard Crowell, Sherman and John Does
Case Number: 2:2014cv00107
Filed: August 26, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Helena Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 61 the partial recommended disposition, in all respects; and dismissing, without prejudice, Plaintiff James Randall Dykes's claims against defendants Sherman and John Does. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/16/2016. (kdr)
May 27, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 56 the partial recommended disposition with two minor clarifications. First, the PRD recommends that Dykes's claims against Obi arising after November 7, 2012, be dismissed without prejudice, which means that Dykes may pursue hi s claims against Obi based on Obi's actions duringtheir August 15, 2012, and October 5, 2012, encounters. Second, all claims against Corizon are dismissed without prejudice based on failure to exhaust administrative remedies, so Dykes's constitutional claim and state law medical malpractice claim may be asserted only against Obi. The 45 motion for partial summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/27/2016. (kdr)
November 5, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: In light of Chief United States District Judge Brian S. Miller's order dismissing Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Dennis Luter, 43 , the Clerk is directed to administratively terminate Luter's motion for summary judgment 30 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 11/5/2015. (jak)
April 27, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 26 the partial recommended disposition; granting 25 Dyke's motion to voluntarily dismiss his claims against Bernard Crowell; dismissing, without prejudice, his claims against Crowell; and removing Crowell as a party defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/27/2015. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dykes v. Corizon Health Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Randall Dykes
Represented By: James A. Simpson, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Brett David Watson(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nwannem Ucoamaka Obi-okoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?